SD SCR11 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 371
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 371
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opposing physician-assisted suicide.
Title
Opposing physician-assisted suicide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 371 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 361 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 338 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 324 |