SD SCR1 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 13. H.J. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging Congress to increase federal funding for special education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to increase federal funding for special education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-11 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-11SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 13. H.J. 40
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced H.J. 35
2019-01-09SenateSenate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 36
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced S.J. 13

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback