SD SCR1 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 24. H.J. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 24. H.J. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opposing the government takeover of health care as currently proposed by Congress and encouraging preservation of states' rights regarding health care regulation.
Title
Opposing the government takeover of health care as currently proposed by Congress and encouraging preservation of states' rights regarding health care regulation.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanford Adelstein [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Richard Curd [R] |
Sen. Thomas Dempster [I] | Sen. Art Fryslie [R] | Sen. Jason Gant [R] | Sen. Cooper Garnos [R] |
Sen. Bob Gray [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Sen. Tom Hansen [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Haverly [R] |
Sen. Gordon Howie [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] | Sen. Daniel Lederman [R] |
Rep. David Lust [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Rep. Nick Moser [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] |
Sen. David Novstrup [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Sen. Russell Olson [R] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] |
Sen. J Putnam [R] | Rep. Val Rausch [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] |
Sen. Lance Russell [R] | Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R] | Sen. Dennis Schmidt [R] | Rep. Manny Steele [R] |
Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Sen. Mike Vehle [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] | Sen. Dean Wink [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 24. H.J. 286 | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced H.J. 260 | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 10. S.J. 179 | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced S.J. 163 |