SD SB99 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Department of Agriculture to contract for the construction of a livestock and equestrian complex at the State Fair, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the Department of Agriculture to contract for the construction of a livestock and equestrian complex at the State Fair, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476 |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 550 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 465 |
2021-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 9. H.J. 514 |
2021-03-04 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 493 |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 483 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 376 |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 6. J.J. 1 |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed J.J. 1 Amendment 99A |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 200 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 102 |
Subjects
Agriculture and Horticulture
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Procurement of Public Improvements
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Procurement of Public Improvements