SD SB98 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Add an exemption from the calculation of adjusted gross proceeds from gaming.
Title
Add an exemption from the calculation of adjusted gross proceeds from gaming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2022 S.J. 462 |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 589 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2022-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 3. H.J. 488 |
2022-02-25 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 325 |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 196 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 163 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 98A |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 95 |