SD SB98 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Vetoed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State S.J. 652
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State S.J. 652
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow certain municipalities to charge a higher occupational tax.
Title
Allow certain municipalities to charge a higher occupational tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 39 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 39 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State S.J. 652 |
2014-03-12 | House | Veto override, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 643 |
2014-03-11 | House | Vetoed by the Governor S.J. 606 |
2014-03-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568 |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 660 |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by President S.J. 540 |
2014-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 31. H.J. 612 |
2014-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 594 |
2014-02-26 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 565 |
2014-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 393 |
2014-02-11 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 375 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 16. S.J. 273 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 239 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 221 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 130 |