SD SB98 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 20, NAYS 11. S.J. 425
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 20, NAYS 11. S.J. 425
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a pilot program initiating two mathematics and science academies and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Provide for a pilot program initiating two mathematics and science academies and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Johnston [R] | Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] | Rep. Tad Perry [R] | Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R] |
Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Education Referred as Amended to Senate Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Education Referred as Amended to Senate Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 20, NAYS 11. S.J. 425 | |
2012-02-13 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 379 | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-09 | Education Referred as Amended to Senate Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 355 | |
2012-02-09 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 98cb | |
2012-02-09 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 98ca | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 127 |