SD SB97 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modify provisions regarding the State-Tribal Relations Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify provisions regarding the State-Tribal Relations Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-10SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 468
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 541
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 43, NAYS 26. H.J. 498
2021-03-03HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2021-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 399
2021-02-24SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 342
2021-02-22SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3.
2021-02-22SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 97A
2021-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 101

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback