SD SB97 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 S.J. 559
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Title vehicles older than thirty years with no existing record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Title vehicles older than thirty years with no existing record.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HouseSigned by the Governor on March 26, 2020 S.J. 559
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 534
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 581
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the President
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the President S.J. 487
2020-03-10HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 480
2020-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 510
2020-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 510 Amendment 97E
2020-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 495
2020-03-03HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-03-03HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2020-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-26HouseReferred to House Transportation H.J. 408
2020-02-12HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 269
2020-02-11SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 190
2020-02-10SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-02-10SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2020-02-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-29SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 109

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback