SD SB96 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the denial of benefits based solely on a controlled substance felony.
Title
Prohibit the denial of benefits based solely on a controlled substance felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 S.J. 558 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 17. H.J. 523 |
2020-03-04 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2020-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 442 |
2020-02-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 421 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 357 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Fiscal Note Requested, Passed S.J. 257 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 108 |