SD SB96 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-4)
Status: Vetoed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State S.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State S.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the expense reimbursement for members of the Board of Pardons and Paroles.
Title
Revise the expense reimbursement for members of the Board of Pardons and Paroles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 0 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State S.J. 629 |
2016-03-29 | House | Veto override, Failed, YEAS 0, NAYS 33. S.J. 626 |
2016-03-29 | House | Vetoed by the Governor S.J. 621 |
2016-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 610 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 871 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by President S.J. 602 |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 589 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 830 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 829 Amendment 96ma |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 805 |
2016-03-03 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 778 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 510 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 488 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 96da |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 306 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 304 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 148 |