SD SB96 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-11)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-11)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the continuation of the waiver of the collaborative agreement requirement for certified nurse midwives providing out-of-hospital birth services.
Title
Provide for the continuation of the waiver of the collaborative agreement requirement for certified nurse midwives providing out-of-hospital birth services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Health and Human Services Hoghoused (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Health and Human Services Hoghoused (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2010-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 585 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 711 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 558 | |
2010-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 2. H.J. 661 | |
2010-03-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 643 | |
2010-02-25 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 612 | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-17 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 448 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 11. S.J. 336 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 322 | |
2010-02-10 | Health and Human Services Title amended, Passed Amendment 96jta | |
2010-02-10 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 274 | |
2010-02-10 | Health and Human Services Hoghoused, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. Amendment 96ja | |
2010-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 212 | |
2010-01-26 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 134 |