SD SB95 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide protection for actions assisting an impaired lawyer or judge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide protection for actions assisting an impaired lawyer or judge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476
2021-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 550
2021-03-10SenateSigned by the President S.J. 470
2021-03-09SenateSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 460
2021-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 496 Amendment 95B
2021-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 495
2021-03-03HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed H.J. 1
2021-03-03HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
2021-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-04HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 213
2021-02-03HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 195
2021-02-02SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 158
2021-01-28SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2
2021-01-28SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-01-28SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 2 Amendment 95A
2021-01-28SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 95

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback