SD SB95 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 17, 2017 S.J. 730
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Add cannabidiol to the list of Schedule IV controlled substances and to exclude it from the definition of marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Add cannabidiol to the list of Schedule IV controlled substances and to exclude it from the definition of marijuana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House of Representatives - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House of Representatives - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor on March 17, 2017 S.J. 730
2017-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 699
2017-03-09HouseSigned by the President S.J. 682
2017-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 739
2017-03-08HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 652
2017-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 13. H.J. 685
2017-03-02HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 3. H.J. 602
2017-03-02HouseHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 95cb
2017-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-02-23HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 499
2017-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 510
2017-02-21SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 452
2017-02-14SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 392
2017-02-14SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. Amendment 95ca
2017-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 200

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=95&Session=2017
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB95P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB95SJU.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB95HHE.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB95ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23215&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23214&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23576&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23991&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24155&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24214&Session=2017&Session=2017

Bill Comments

feedback