SD SB95 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 22. H.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions related to human trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions related to human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-12 - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 22. H.J. 756
2015-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 744 Amendment cc95a
2015-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 699
2015-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 693 Amendment Cc95a
2015-03-11HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 723
2015-03-11HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 665
2015-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 668
2015-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 667 Amendment 95rd
2015-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 643
2015-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 620
2015-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 600
2015-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 581
2015-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557
2015-02-26HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 536
2015-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-02-19HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 453
2015-02-18SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 437
2015-02-12SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 388
2015-02-12SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 95ra
2015-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-02-05SenateDeferred by Chair
2015-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-27SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 187

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=95&Session=2015
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/SB95P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/SB95SJU.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/SB95H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=18628&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=18774&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19113&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19631&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19822&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19857&Session=2015

Bill Comments

feedback