SD SB95 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Signed by Governor S.J. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain vehicle dealer licensing provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain vehicle dealer licensing provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-26HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 476
2014-02-21HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 396
2014-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 477
2014-02-19HouseSigned by President S.J. 373
2014-02-18HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 432
2014-02-13HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2014-02-13HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 410
2014-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-02-07HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 339
2014-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 243
2014-02-05SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2014-02-05SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 221
2014-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 129

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback