SD SB95 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the printing of voting rights notices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the printing of voting rights notices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House of Representatives - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House of Representatives - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-08 Signed by Governor S.J. 644
2011-03-02 Delivered to the Governor S.J. 587
2011-03-01 Signed by Speaker H.J. 585
2011-02-28 Signed by President S.J. 562
2011-02-25 House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 533
2011-02-24 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 526
2011-02-23 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 504
2011-02-22 Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 461
2011-02-22 Scheduled for hearing
2011-02-09 First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 338
2011-02-08 Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 364
2011-02-07 Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 330
2011-02-07 Scheduled for hearing
2011-01-24 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 176

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback