SD SB93 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 662
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 662
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Impose a gross receipts tax on the rental of certain motorcycles in lieu of the excise tax on motor vehicles.
Title
Impose a gross receipts tax on the rental of certain motorcycles in lieu of the excise tax on motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 662 |
2015-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 578 |
2015-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 581 |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by President S.J. 552 |
2015-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 548 |
2015-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 529 |
2015-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 503 |
2015-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 471 |
2015-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 458 |
2015-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443 |
2015-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 418 |
2015-02-12 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1. H.J. 394 |
2015-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-05 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 305 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 287 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 243 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 187 |