SD SB92 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 20. S.J. 240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 20. S.J. 240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the repurposing of STAR Academy.
Title
To provide for the repurposing of STAR Academy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 20. S.J. 240 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 233 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 204 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 188 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 174 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 153 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 108 |