SD SB92 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Continue a math pilot project at the South Dakota School of Mines and Technology, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Continue a math pilot project at the South Dakota School of Mines and Technology, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 18. H.J. 829 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 805 |
2016-03-03 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 777 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 510 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 510 Amendment 92ga |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. S.J. 485 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 212 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 208 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 140 |