SD SB91 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding the salary for state's attorneys.
Title
Revise provisions regarding the salary for state's attorneys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020 S.J. 557 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 505 |
2020-03-05 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-05 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 432 |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading House H.J. 229 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 158 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 107 |