SD SB91 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning the information on the forms provided to persons who sign initiated constitutional amendments, referred laws, or initiated measures.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning the information on the forms provided to persons who sign initiated constitutional amendments, referred laws, or initiated measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618 |
2016-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2016 S.J. 585 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 555 |
2016-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 1. H.J. 778 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-02 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 749 |
2016-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 360 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 262 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-05 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 91fta |
2016-02-05 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 229 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 91oa |
2016-02-05 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 91fa |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 139 |