SD SB90 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-5)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 16. S.J. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 16. S.J. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the distribution of motor fuel tax revenue, create a small structure and large culvert fund, provide for the use and administration of the fund, and to make an appropriation thereof.
Title
Revise the distribution of motor fuel tax revenue, create a small structure and large culvert fund, provide for the use and administration of the fund, and to make an appropriation thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 16. S.J. 210 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 188 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 174 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 168 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 90A |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 107 |