SD SB90 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Approval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 1. H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Approval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 1. H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the payment of taxes and fees before transferring title of mobile homes or manufactured homes.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the payment of taxes and fees before transferring title of mobile homes or manufactured homes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim White [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] |
Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Sen. Michael Diedrich [R] | Sen. David Johnson [R] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] |
Rep. Charles Turbiville [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Approval of style and form veto (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Approval of style and form veto (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Approval of style and form veto (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Approval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 1. H.J. 800 |
2018-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Delivered Style and Form S.J. 798 |
2018-03-26 | House | Approval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 796 |
2018-03-26 | House | Vetoed for Style and Form S.J. 794 |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2018 S.J. 736 |
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 712 |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 704 |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 635 |
2018-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 606 |
2018-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 606 Amendment 90ab |
2018-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 592 |
2018-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 565 |
2018-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 539 |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-15 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 472 |
2018-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 224 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 250 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 219 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 156 |