SD SB90 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 662
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 662
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require school districts to provide veterans a preference in employment.
Title
Require school districts to provide veterans a preference in employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] |
Rep. Patrick Kirschman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 662 |
2015-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 578 |
2015-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 581 |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by President S.J. 552 |
2015-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 544 |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-25 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 509 |
2015-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 430 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 418 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 387 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 169 |