SD SB90 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning tax incremental districts.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning tax incremental districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Signed by Governor S.J. 644 | |
2011-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568 | |
2011-02-28 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 563 | |
2011-02-25 | Signed by President S.J. 542 | |
2011-02-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 12. H.J. 525 | |
2011-02-23 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 504 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 483 | |
2011-02-17 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1. H.J. 440 | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-03 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 280 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 304 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 304 Amendment 90fb | |
2011-02-01 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 282 | |
2011-01-26 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 219 | |
2011-01-26 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 90oa | |
2011-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 175 |