SD SB90 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an exception from one-call notification requirements to natural gas operators in emergency situations.
Title
Provide an exception from one-call notification requirements to natural gas operators in emergency situations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2010-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 585 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 711 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 558 | |
2010-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 653 | |
2010-03-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 643 | |
2010-02-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 618 | |
2010-02-24 | Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 597 | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-11 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 367 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 282 | |
2010-02-09 | Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 254 | |
2010-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 130 |