SD SB9 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 15, 2022 S.J. 250
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 15, 2022 S.J. 250
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the definition of a designated caregiver.
Title
Revise the definition of a designated caregiver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 15, 2022 S.J. 250 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 09, 2022 S.J. 221 |
2022-02-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 240 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 200 |
2022-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 212 |
2022-02-03 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-02-03 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 105 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 5. S.J. 91 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 1 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 12 |