SD SB9 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 S.J. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 S.J. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the Department of Labor and Regulation's retirement plan and to transfer plan members and funds to the South Dakota Retirement System.
Title
Repeal the Department of Labor and Regulation's retirement plan and to transfer plan members and funds to the South Dakota Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 S.J. 363 |
2020-02-24 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 24, 2020 S.J. 321 |
2020-02-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 352 |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 297 |
2020-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 323 |
2020-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 304 |
2020-02-12 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 77 |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 64 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 77 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 11 |