SD SB9 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to the Interim Appropriations Committee.
Title
Revise provisions related to the Interim Appropriations Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 673 |
2014-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 581 |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 672 |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by President S.J. 563 |
2014-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 633 |
2014-03-03 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 598 |
2014-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 533 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 433 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 376 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 9ma |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 14 |