SD SB9 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Signed by Governor S.J. 592
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Signed by Governor S.J. 592
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to accept the donation of land from the University of South Dakota Foundation for the use and benefit of the University of South Dakota.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to accept the donation of land from the University of South Dakota Foundation for the use and benefit of the University of South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 592 |
2013-02-20 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 480 |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 445 |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by President S.J. 439 |
2013-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 414 |
2013-02-13 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 366 |
2013-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-05 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 304 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 314 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 286 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 24 |