SD SB9 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Signed by Governor S.J. 461
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Signed by Governor S.J. 461
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding eligibility requirements for the state risk pool.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding eligibility requirements for the state risk pool.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Signed by Governor S.J. 461 | |
2011-02-15 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 429 | |
2011-02-14 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 385 | |
2011-02-10 | Signed by President S.J. 404 | |
2011-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 7. H.J. 343 | |
2011-02-08 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 310 | |
2011-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-26 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 186 | |
2011-01-25 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 202 | |
2011-01-21 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-01-21 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 161 | |
2011-01-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 16 |