SD SB89 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 37. H.J. 578
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 37. H.J. 578
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require the development of school safety plans and to require the conduct of lockdown drills in accredited schools.
Title
Require the development of school safety plans and to require the conduct of lockdown drills in accredited schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 37. H.J. 578 |
2015-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557 |
2015-02-25 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 509 |
2015-02-25 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 89cb |
2015-02-25 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 89ca |
2015-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 288 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 273 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 253 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 232 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 168 |