SD SB89 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 55-12)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempt from federal regulation any firearm, firearm accessory, or ammunition manufactured and retained in South Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt from federal regulation any firearm, firearm accessory, or ammunition manufactured and retained in South Dakota.

Sponsors

Rep. Gene Abdallah [R]Sen. Stanford Adelstein [R]Rep. Julie Bartling [D]Sen. Jim Bolin [R]
Sen. Jim Bradford [D]Sen. Corey Brown [R]Rep. Thomas Brunner [R]Rep. Lance Carson [R]
Sen. Justin Cronin [R]Sen. Richard Curd [R]Rep. Thomas Deadrick [R]Rep. Paul Dennert [D]
Rep. Bob Faehn [R]Rep. Mitchell Fargen [D]Rep. Dennis Feickert [D]Sen. Jason Frerichs [D]
Sen. Art Fryslie [R]Sen. Jason Gant [R]Sen. Cooper Garnos [R]Sen. Bob Gray [R]
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R]Rep. Noel Hamiel [R]Sen. Tom Hansen [R]Sen. Gary Hanson [D]
Sen. Jeffrey Haverly [R]Rep. Charles Hoffman [R]Sen. Gordon Howie [R]Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D]
Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R]Rep. Roger Hunt [R]Rep. Phil Jensen [R]Rep. Kent Juhnke [R]
Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R]Rep. Frank Kloucek [D]Rep. Don Kopp [R]Sen. Shantel Krebs [R]
Sen. Daniel Lederman [R]Sen. Ryan Maher [R]Sen. Kathleen Miles [D]Rep. Nick Moser [R]
Sen. Thomas Nelson [R]Rep. Kristi Noem [R]Sen. Al Novstrup [R]Sen. David Novstrup [R]
Sen. Betty Olson [R]Sen. Russell Olson [R]Sen. Deb Peters [R]Sen. Jim Peterson [D]
Sen. J Putnam [R]Rep. Val Rausch [R]Sen. Timothy Rave [R]Rep. Larry Rhoden [R]
Rep. Fred Romkema [R]Rep. Tim Rounds [R]Sen. Lance Russell [R]Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R]
Sen. Dennis Schmidt [R]Rep. Dean Schrempp [D]Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R]Rep. Roger Solum [R]
Rep. Manny Steele [R]Rep. Larry Tidemann [R]Rep. Charles Turbiville [R]Sen. Bill Van Gerpen [R]
Rep. Kim Vanneman [R]Rep. Mike Verchio [R]Rep. Dean Wink [R]

Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-12 Signed by Governor S.J. 673
2010-03-09 Delivered to the Governor S.J. 608
2010-03-08 Signed by Speaker H.J. 755
2010-03-04 Signed by President S.J. 573
2010-03-03 House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 19. H.J. 680
2010-03-02 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 663
2010-03-01 State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 626
2010-03-01 Scheduled for hearing
2010-02-19 First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 492
2010-02-18 Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 4. S.J. 372
2010-02-17 State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 349
2010-02-17 Scheduled for hearing
2010-01-22 First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 123

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback