SD SB88 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-24)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-24)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the interstate compact on educational opportunity for military children.
Title
Adopt the interstate compact on educational opportunity for military children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 622 | |
2010-03-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 737 | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 709 | |
2010-03-03 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 669 | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 317 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 237 | |
2010-02-02 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 204 | |
2010-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-22 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 123 |