SD SB87 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1. S.J. 473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1. S.J. 473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain programs and promote efficiency in state government and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Revise certain programs and promote efficiency in state government and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1. S.J. 473 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 139 |