SD SB87 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow military spouses to receive unemployment compensation if they leave their jobs due to a spouse's military transfer.
Title
Allow military spouses to receive unemployment compensation if they leave their jobs due to a spouse's military transfer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Signed by Governor S.J. 640 | |
2012-02-24 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 555 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 588 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by President S.J. 511 | |
2012-02-21 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 14. H.J. 529 | |
2012-02-16 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 513 | |
2012-02-15 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 480 | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-09 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 390 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 326 | |
2012-02-07 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 291 | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 124 |