SD SB86 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-6)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain requirements when a local unit of government sells surplus property through a real estate broker.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain requirements when a local unit of government sells surplus property through a real estate broker.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseSigned by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756
2018-03-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2018 S.J. 736
2018-03-06HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 712
2018-03-05HouseSigned by the President S.J. 704
2018-03-01HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 663
2018-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 5. H.J. 633
2018-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 633 Amendment 86db
2018-02-26HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 594
2018-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 224
2018-01-25SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 249
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-01-24SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 219
2018-01-24SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-18SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 134

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=86&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB86P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB86H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB86ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24808&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24928&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24808&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24928&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26335&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26494&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26643&Session=2018

Bill Comments 750

feedback