SD SB86 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the deposit of county funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the deposit of county funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10HouseSigned by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743
2017-03-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2017 S.J. 654
2017-03-06HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 675
2017-03-01HouseSigned by the President S.J. 608
2017-02-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 572
2017-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 558
2017-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 539
2017-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 521
2017-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 477
2017-02-21HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 427
2017-02-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-02-03HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 296
2017-02-02SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 277
2017-02-01SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 247
2017-02-01SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 181

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback