SD SB86 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. S.J. 611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend the 2017 General Appropriations Act to revise certain programs and promote efficiency in state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend the 2017 General Appropriations Act to revise certain programs and promote efficiency in state government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. S.J. 611
2016-03-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-03-09SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-03-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-03-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-02-29SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-02-24SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-02-18SenateDeferred by Chair
2016-02-18SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 86na
2016-02-18SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-01-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 138

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback