SD SB86 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Place a term limit on the office of poet laureate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Place a term limit on the office of poet laureate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-13HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 714
2015-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 632
2015-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 644
2015-03-05HouseSigned by President S.J. 613
2015-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 595
2015-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 581
2015-02-27HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 552
2015-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-02-10HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 361
2015-02-09SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 341
2015-02-05SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 296
2015-02-05SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 86ra
2015-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 104

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback