SD SB86 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to the state aeronautics fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to the state aeronautics fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Appropriations Tabled (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-19SenateAppropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 378
2014-02-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-02-13SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-02-07SenateDeferred by Chair
2014-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 112

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback