SD SB86 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Signed by Governor S.J. 713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increase the minimum salary payable to county officials, state's attorneys, and sheriffs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase the minimum salary payable to county officials, state's attorneys, and sheriffs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-07HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 713
2013-03-04HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 634
2013-02-28HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 598
2013-02-26HouseSigned by President S.J. 586
2013-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 27. H.J. 524
2013-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507
2013-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 491
2013-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 472
2013-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443
2013-02-15HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 425
2013-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 414
2013-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 375
2013-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 360
2013-02-07HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 338
2013-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing
2013-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 190
2013-01-24SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 206
2013-01-23SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 162
2013-01-23SenateScheduled for hearing
2013-01-17SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 131

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback