SD SB86 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 615
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Grant limited immunity from arrest and prosecution for certain alcohol consumption related offenses to persons who assist certain persons in need of emergency assistance or who are themselves in need of emergency assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grant limited immunity from arrest and prosecution for certain alcohol consumption related offenses to persons who assist certain persons in need of emergency assistance or who are themselves in need of emergency assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-24 Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 615
2012-02-24 Scheduled for hearing
2012-02-06 First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 314
2012-02-02 Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 6. S.J. 267
2012-01-31 Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 227
2012-01-31 Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. Amendment 86ra
2012-01-31 Scheduled for hearing
2012-01-23 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 124

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback