SD SB85 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 11. H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modify the composition of the Retirement Laws Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify the composition of the Retirement Laws Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 11. H.J. 470
2021-03-01HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 1
2021-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-11HouseReferred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 284
2021-02-10HouseReferred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 280
2021-02-09HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 254
2021-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 13. S.J. 210
2021-02-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 202
2021-02-03SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
2021-02-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-21SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 88

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback