SD SB85 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 9, NAYS 25. S.J. 511
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the exemption of certain students from the requirement to take certain academic assessment tests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the exemption of certain students from the requirement to take certain academic assessment tests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 9, NAYS 25. S.J. 511
2017-02-22SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 510 Amendment 85cb
2017-02-21SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 452
2017-02-16SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 413
2017-02-14SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 380
2017-02-14SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 85ca
2017-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 181

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback