SD SB85 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2016 S.J. 408
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding motorcycle license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding motorcycle license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-23HouseSigned by the Governor on February 23, 2016 S.J. 408
2016-02-22HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 22, 2016 S.J. 378
2016-02-19HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 470
2016-02-18HouseSigned by the President S.J. 349
2016-02-17HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 415
2016-02-16HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2016-02-16HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 393
2016-02-16HouseScheduled for hearing
2016-02-10HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 359
2016-02-09SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 266
2016-02-05SenateTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 228
2016-02-05SenateTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 85fa
2016-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-01-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 138

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback