SD SB85 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 502
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal certain requirements regarding the handlebar height on motorcycles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal certain requirements regarding the handlebar height on motorcycles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-25HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 502
2015-02-20HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 463
2015-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 459
2015-02-18HouseSigned by President S.J. 439
2015-02-17HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 410
2015-02-12HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2015-02-12HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 397
2015-02-12HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-02-06HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 327
2015-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 306
2015-02-04SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 278
2015-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 104

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback