SD SB85 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding confidential criminal justice information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding confidential criminal justice information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-31HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 688
2014-03-13HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 652
2014-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 750
2014-03-11HouseSigned by President S.J. 629
2014-03-10HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 688
2014-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 671
2014-03-05HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 645
2014-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-02-18HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 429
2014-02-13SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 335
2014-02-11SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 283
2014-02-11SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 85oa
2014-02-11SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 112

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback