SD SB85 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - Signed by Governor S.J. 634
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the production incentive payment available to ethanol producers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the production incentive payment available to ethanol producers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-04HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 634
2013-02-26HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 574
2013-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 536
2013-02-22HouseSigned by President S.J. 545
2013-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 485
2013-02-20HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2013-02-20HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 450
2013-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2013-01-29HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 232
2013-01-28SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 252
2013-01-28SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 251 Amendment 85ja
2013-01-25SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 229
2013-01-24SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 196
2013-01-24SenateScheduled for hearing
2013-01-17SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 131

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback